+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On May 31, 2016 in the House:
- Adopted Both Houses
On May 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Resolution Adopted; 057-000-000
On May 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 26, 2016
- Be Adopted Transportation; 015-000-000
On May 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Transportation
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- Arrive in Senate
On May 5, 2016 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted 110-000-000
On April 5, 2016 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
On April 4, 2016 in the House:
- Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 020-000-000
On March 23, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On January 14, 2016 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
+ − Votes (4)
May 31, 2016: HJR0116 - Motion To Adopt
May 24, 2016: HJR0116 - Transportation
May 5, 2016: HJR0116
April 4, 2016: HJR0116 - Transportation, Regulation, Roads
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor