+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On May 28, 2018 in the House:
- Adopted Both Houses
On May 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Resolution Adopted; 051-000-000
On May 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 25, 2018
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
On May 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin
- Arrive in Senate
On April 25, 2018 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted 112-000-000
On April 19, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions
On April 17, 2018 in the House:
- Recommends Be Adopted Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 010-000-000
On April 3, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jerry Lee Long
+ − Votes (3)
May 28, 2018: HJR0105 - Motion To Adopt
April 25, 2018: HJR0105
April 17, 2018: HJR0105 - Transportation: Regulation, Roads
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor