+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On June 1, 2021 in the House:
- Adopted Both Houses
On June 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Resolution Adopted
On May 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Secretary's Desk Resolutions May 26, 2021
- Be Adopted Behavioral and Mental Health; 009-000-000
On May 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Behavioral and Mental Health
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
- Arrive in Senate
On April 23, 2021 in the House:
- Resolution Adopted 099-000-000
On April 16, 2021 in the House:
- Resolutions - Consent Calendar - Fourth Day
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Resolutions - Consent Calendar - Third Day
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Resolutions - Consent Calendar - Second Day
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Resolutions - Consent Calendar
On March 24, 2021 in the House:
- Recommends Be Adopted - Consent Calendar Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 023-000-000
On March 16, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
On January 14, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Maurice A. West, II
+ − Votes (3)
May 25, 2021: HJR0001 - Behavioral and Mental Health
April 23, 2021: HJR0001
March 24, 2021: HJR0001 - Elem Sec Ed: School Curric Policies
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor