+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (28)
On January 11, 2011 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 12, 2009 in the Senate:
- Sponsor Removed Sen. Don Harmon
On May 8, 2009 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On May 6, 2009 in the Senate:
- Held in Agriculture and Conservation
On April 29, 2009 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Agriculture and Conservation
On April 22, 2009 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Agriculture and Conservation
On April 21, 2009 in the Senate:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Gary Forby
On April 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
On April 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 21, 2009
- Arrive in Senate
On April 1, 2009 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40(a)
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-001-000
On March 31, 2009 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On March 30, 2009 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-000-000
On March 27, 2009 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Raymond Poe
On March 26, 2009 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Raymond Poe
On March 11, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 10, 2009 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 012-000-000
On February 18, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
On February 10, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Raymond Poe
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- 20 ILCS 805/805-305 - was 20 ILCS 805/63a23
- 515 ILCS 5/20-47 -
- 520 ILCS 5/3.1-4 -
+ − Vote
April 1, 2009: HB0998 - Wednesday, April 01, 2009
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor