+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On August 16, 2013 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0376
- Effective Date January 1, 2014
- Governor Approved
On June 19, 2013 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 21, 2013 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 053-001-000
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2013
- Second Reading
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2013
- Do Pass Transportation; 015-000-000
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Transportation
On March 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
On March 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 12, 2013
- Arrive in Senate
On March 8, 2013 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 108-007-000
On March 6, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 27, 2013 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 009-000-000
On February 13, 2013 in the House:
- Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
On January 29, 2013 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 28, 2013 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David Reis
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Votes (2)
May 21, 2013: HB0989 - Third Reading - Tuesday, May 21, 2013
March 8, 2013: HB0989 - Third Reading - Friday, March 08, 2013
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor