+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On August 13, 2007 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 95-0091
- Effective Date January 1, 2008
- Governor Approved
On June 14, 2007 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 16, 2007 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 16, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
On May 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2007
- Second Reading
On May 10, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2007
- Do Pass Human Services; 009-000-000
On May 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Human Services
On April 26, 2007 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Referred to Rules
On April 25, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000
On March 27, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 14, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 009-000-000
On March 8, 2007 in the House:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios
On February 15, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On February 8, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Daniel V. Beiser
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (2)
May 16, 2007: HB0984 - Third Reading - Wednesday, May 16, 2007
April 25, 2007: HB0984 - Third Reading - Wednesday, April 25, 2007
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor