+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 13, 2003 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 24, 2003 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Filed
On January 23, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On January 8, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 7, 2003 in the House:
- Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- 210 ILCS 60/3 - from Ch. 111 1/2, par. 6103
- 210 ILCS 60/4 - from Ch. 111 1/2, par. 6104
- 210 ILCS 60/5 - from Ch. 111 1/2, par. 6105
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor