+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On September 28, 2017 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 25, 2017 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 29, 2017 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
On March 22, 2017 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On January 31, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
+ − Vote
March 29, 2017: HB0947 - Executive
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor