+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 25, 2007 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 18, 2007 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2007
On May 10, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 18, 2007
On May 3, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 10, 2007
On May 1, 2007 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
On April 27, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 3, 2007
On March 22, 2007 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robert F. Flider
On March 1, 2007 in the House:
- Fiscal Note Filed
On February 22, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 006-000-003
On February 15, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On February 8, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert F. Flider
+ − Adopted Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 305 ILCS 5/5-2 - from Ch. 23, par. 5-2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor