+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On January 9, 2007 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On April 15, 2005 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 14, 2005 in the House:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
On April 8, 2005 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 25, 2005 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On February 24, 2005 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Registration and Regulation Committee; 026-000-000
On February 17, 2005 in the House:
- Re-assigned to Registration and Regulation Committee
On February 8, 2005 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 3, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 2, 2005 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Angelo Saviano
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor