+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 27, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. LaToya Greenwood
On March 12, 2019 in the House:
- Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
- Moved to Suspend Rule 21 Rep. Gregory Harris
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter School
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 25, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. LaToya Greenwood
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor