+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On January 9, 2007 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On November 4, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On March 16, 2005 in the House:
- Co-Sponsor Rep. John D'Amico
- Co-Sponsor Rep. Eddie Washington
On March 9, 2005 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 10, 2005
- Arrive in Senate
On March 8, 2005 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 094-022-000
On March 3, 2005 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 18, 2005 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Computer Technology Committee; 006-000-000
On February 8, 2005 in the House:
- Assigned to Computer Technology Committee
On February 2, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Marlow H. Colvin
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Vote
March 8, 2005: HB0907 - Third Reading - Tuesday, March 08, 2005
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor