+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On August 9, 2019 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0235
- Effective Date January 1, 2020
- Governor Approved
On June 28, 2019 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 31, 2019 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 31, 2019 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 033-018-000
On May 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2019
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019
- Second Reading
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2019
- Do Pass Criminal Law; 006-003-001
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Criminal Law
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Criminal Law
On April 4, 2019 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 067-043-000
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Fiscal Note Filed
On February 19, 2019 in the House:
- Correctional Note Filed
- Correctional Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
- Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-006-000
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 24, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
+ − Statutes Amended (5)
- 730 ILCS 5/3-2-2 - from Ch. 38, par. 1003-2-2
- 730 ILCS 5/3-12-2 - from Ch. 38, par. 1003-12-2
- 730 ILCS 5/3-12-5 - from Ch. 38, par. 1003-12-5
- 730 ILCS 5/3-7-6 rep. -
- 735 ILCS 5/4-101 - from Ch. 110, par. 4-101
+ − Votes (4)
May 31, 2019: HB0900 - Third Reading
May 7, 2019: HB0900 - Criminal Law
April 4, 2019: HB0900 - Third Reading
February 13, 2019: HB0900 - Judiciary - Criminal
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor