+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On June 23, 2020 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 13, 2019 in the House:
- To Workforce Development Subcommittee
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Labor & Commerce Committee
On January 9, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On November 30, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers
+ − Statute Amended
- New Act -