+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (31)
On January 9, 2007 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On July 1, 2005 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 19, 2005 in the House:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Sandra M. Pihos
On May 18, 2005 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
- Arrived in House
On May 18, 2005 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
On May 11, 2005 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 12, 2005
- Second Reading
On May 5, 2005 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2005
- Do Pass as Amended Judiciary; 010-000-000
On May 3, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary
On April 21, 2005 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kirk W. Dillard
On April 20, 2005 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Judiciary
On April 13, 2005 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Judiciary
On March 15, 2005 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On March 9, 2005 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 10, 2005
- Arrive in Senate
On March 8, 2005 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000
On February 25, 2005 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 18, 2005 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee; 016-000-000
On February 10, 2005 in the House:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Sandra M. Pihos
On February 8, 2005 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary II - Criminal Law Committee
On February 2, 2005 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. John J. Millner
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963. Provides that a statement of a witness is not excluded at the trial of any defendant by the hearsay rule or as a violation of any right to confront witnesses if the witness was murdered, bribed, or otherwise intimidated by the defendant, or one for whose conduct he or she is legally accountable, to prevent the witness from testifying or participating in any criminal investigation or prosecution against the defendant. Establishes the criteria for admission of a statement under the exception.
+ − Statute Amended
- 725 ILCS 120/6 - from Ch. 38, par. 1406
+ − Votes (2)
May 18, 2005: HB0893 - Third Reading - Wednesday, May 18, 2005
March 8, 2005: HB0893 - Third Reading - Tuesday, March 08, 2005
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor