+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 11, 2011 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 15, 2010 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 2, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned to Elections & Campaign Reform Committee
On March 13, 2009 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 18, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned to Elections & Campaign Reform Committee
On February 10, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mike Boland
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor