+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On January 11, 2011 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 15, 2010 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 2, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned to Elections & Campaign Reform Committee
On March 13, 2009 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 18, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned to Elections & Campaign Reform Committee
On February 10, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mike Boland
+ − Statutes Amended (15)
- 10 ILCS 5/Art. 9A heading new -
- 10 ILCS 5/9A-5 new -
- 10 ILCS 5/9A-10 new -
- 10 ILCS 5/9A-15 new -
- 10 ILCS 5/9A-20 new -
- 10 ILCS 5/9A-25 new -
- 10 ILCS 5/9A-30 new -
- 10 ILCS 5/9A-35 new -
- 10 ILCS 5/9A-40 new -
- 10 ILCS 5/9A-45 new -
- 10 ILCS 5/9A-50 new -
- 10 ILCS 5/9A-55 new -
- 30 ILCS 105/5.719 new -
- 35 ILCS 5/506.7 new -
- 35 ILCS 5/509 - from Ch. 120, par. 5-509
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor