+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (35)
On July 30, 2021 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0178
- Effective Date October 30, 2021
- Governor Approved
On June 23, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 27, 2021 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 037-015-000
On May 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 26, 2021
- Second Reading
On May 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 20, 2021
- Do Pass Health; 009-002-000
On May 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Health
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
On April 23, 2021 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 067-041-000
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 20, 2021 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers
On April 6, 2021 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 009-006-000
On February 23, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On January 14, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Amendment 002
Makes the bill effective 3 months after it becomes law.
+ − Proposed Amendments (2)
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (4)
May 27, 2021: HB0088 - Third Reading
May 18, 2021: HB0088 - Health
April 23, 2021: HB0088 - Third Reading
March 9, 2021: HB0088 - Human Services
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor