+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2008; Substantive House Bills Out of Committee
On April 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On March 29, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 30, 2007
- Arrive in Senate
On March 28, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000
On March 27, 2007 in the House:
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On March 20, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; 021-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
On February 15, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education Committee
On February 7, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lisa M. Dugan
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Amends the School Construction Law. Prohibits a grant index from being recalculated when a school district has received its entitlement, but the State has failed to appropriate sufficient funding. Provides that the prohibition applies to those entitlements obtained in fiscal year 2002 or thereafter. Effective immediately.
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
+ − Vote
March 28, 2007: HB0877 - Third Reading - Wednesday, March 28, 2007
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor