+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 19, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
On March 11, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. LaToya Greenwood
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- To Property Tax Subcommittee
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. LaToya Greenwood
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor