+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On June 23, 2020 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Higher Education Committee
- Assigned to Higher Education Committee
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 22, 2019 in the House:
- To Special Issues Subcommittee (HED)
On March 5, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Higher Education Committee
On February 26, 2019 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. LaToya Greenwood
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Higher Education Committee
On January 28, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 23, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. LaToya Greenwood