+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On January 8, 2013 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On April 15, 2011 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
On April 14, 2011 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee
On April 13, 2011 in the House:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
On March 17, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
On February 8, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On January 31, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
+ − Adopted Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 605 ILCS 5/5-701 - from Ch. 121, par. 5-701
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor