+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 27, 2021 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- To Property Tax Subcommittee
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William Davis
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor