+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (33)
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On August 24, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Rules
On May 27, 2004 in the Senate:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Peter J. Roskam
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Approved for Consideration Rules
On May 26, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Peter J. Roskam
On May 17, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 18, 2004
- Approved for Consideration Rules
On May 13, 2004 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Deadline Extended - Rule 2-10, extended to January 11, 2005.
On July 1, 2003 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Rules
On May 16, 2003 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Deadline Extended - Rule 2-10, to December 31, 2003.
On May 6, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 7, 2003
- Second Reading
On May 1, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 6, 2003
- Do Pass Executive; 007-004-000
On April 16, 2003 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On April 8, 2003 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 9, 2003
- Arrive in Senate
On April 3, 2003 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 069-044-004
On April 2, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate **
On March 31, 2003 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 12, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 010-000-000
On February 4, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On January 31, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert S. Molaro
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
+ − Adopted Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 35 ILCS 105/1 - from Ch. 120, par. 439.1