+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (43)
On January 11, 2011 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On August 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On May 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Non-Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 - May 27, 2009
- Secretary's Desk - Non-Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
On May 26, 2009 in the House:
- House Non-Concurs by Voice Vote; SA 1 Motion #2
On May 22, 2009 in the House:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Non-Concur Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr.; Motion #2
On May 19, 2009 in the House:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000; Motion #1
On May 18, 2009 in the House:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee; Motion #1
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr.; Motion #1
On May 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- Verified
On May 15, 2009 in the House:
- Arrived in House
On May 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 031-020-000
On May 15, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
On May 14, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2009
- Second Reading
On May 6, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2009
- Do Pass as Amended Elections; 005-004-000
On May 5, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Elections
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael Bond
On April 29, 2009 in the Senate:
- Postponed - Elections
On April 22, 2009 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Elections
On April 21, 2009 in the Senate:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Michael Bond
On March 30, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
On March 26, 2009 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 099-017-000
On March 25, 2009 in the House:
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Lou Lang
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr.
On March 19, 2009 in the House:
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On March 11, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 10, 2009 in the House:
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elections & Campaign Reform Committee; 007-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elections & Campaign Reform Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Elections & Campaign Reform Committee
On February 5, 2009 in the House:
- Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed
- Moved to Suspend Rule 25 Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
On February 4, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned to Elections & Campaign Reform Committee
On January 14, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 9, 2009 in the House:
- Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Provides that the Commission is created within the State Board of Elections.
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Provides that the Commission is created within the State Board of Elections.
+ − Statute Amended
- New Act -