+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On August 16, 2021 in the House:
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date August 16, 2021
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0390
On June 23, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 27, 2021 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 25, 2021
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2021
On May 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Do Pass Executive; 017-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2021
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
On April 16, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 108-000-000
On April 13, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading - Consent Calendar
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote
- Do Pass as Amended / Consent Calendar Executive Committee; 015-000-000
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Natalie A. Manley
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Natalie A. Manley
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Illinois Lottery Law. Extends the sale of the special instant scratch-off game to benefit Alzheimer's care, support, education, and awareness to January 1, 2025 (rather than January 1, 2022). Effective immediately.
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Votes (5)
May 27, 2021: HB0848
May 5, 2021: HB0848 - Executive
April 16, 2021: HB0848
April 16, 2021: HB0848 - Third Reading
March 17, 2021: HB0848 - Executive
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor