+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On January 11, 2011 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On April 3, 2009 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Placed on Calendar - Consideration Postponed
- Third Reading - Consideration Postponed
On March 17, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 4, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 006-004-000
On February 11, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 9, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Edward J. Acevedo
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 430 ILCS 65/8 - from Ch. 38, par. 83-8
- 720 ILCS 5/24-4.1 new -