+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (28)
On January 11, 2011 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On June 27, 2010 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On April 27, 2010 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 28, 2010
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
On August 15, 2009 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On May 29, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 30, 2009
- Second Reading
On May 26, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 27, 2009
- Do Pass as Amended Appropriations I; 007-004-000
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
On May 22, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Appropriations I
On May 20, 2009 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Donne E. Trotter; -Schoenberg
On April 22, 2009 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Appropriations I
On April 2, 2009 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
On March 31, 2009 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 1, 2009
- Arrive in Senate
On March 31, 2009 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 076-040-000
On March 25, 2009 in the House:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios
On March 3, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 26, 2009 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Appropriations-Human Services Committee; 019-000-000
On February 4, 2009 in the House:
- Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
On January 14, 2009 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 9, 2009 in the House:
- Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Lou Lang
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Committee Amendment No. 1
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Appropriates $2 from the General Revenue Fund to the General Assembly for its ordinary and contingent expenses. Effective July 1, 2009.
+ − Vote
March 31, 2009: HB0083 - Third Reading - Tuesday, March 31, 2009
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor