+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (49)
On January 8, 2013 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On January 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Postponed - Executive
On January 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Executive
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan Kotowski
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Dan Kotowski
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading January 2, 2013
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan Kotowski
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As January 8, 2013
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Public Health; 006-003-000
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading January 3, 2013
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan Kotowski
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Public Health
On July 23, 2011 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On May 31, 2011 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 31, 2011
- Do Pass Energy; 016-001-000
On May 30, 2011 in the Senate:
- Waive Posting Notice
On May 28, 2011 in the Senate:
- Senator Koehler makes a motion to waive all posting requirements, so bill can be heard in Committee on May 29, 2011.
- Assigned to Energy
- Senator Righter request a Roll Call on that motion.
- Senator Koehler withdraws motion to waive posting requirements.
On May 27, 2011 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2011
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
On May 27, 2011 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 070-045-001
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted by Voice Vote
On May 25, 2011 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Executive Committee; 011-000-000
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee
On May 23, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2011
- Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-001-000
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Thomas Holbrook
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 15, 2011 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 17, 2011 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
On February 8, 2011 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On January 31, 2011 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
+ − Adopted Amendments (4)
House Floor Amendment No. 1
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Illinois Nuclear Safety Preparedness Act. Increases, beginning in fiscal year 2012, the fee that must be paid by the owners of each licensed nuclear power reactor in the State. Changes, beginning in fiscal year 2012, the dates by which those fees must be paid. Imposes an additional fee for a limited time on the owners of each licensed nuclear power reactor in the State for the purpose of upgrading remote monitoring system software and acquiring, replacing, and upgrading specified equipment. Effective immediately.
+ − Statute Amended
- 420 ILCS 5/1 - from Ch. 111 1/2, par. 4301