+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 14, 2019 in the House:
- To Sales, Amusement & Other Taxes Subcommittee
On February 5, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
On January 22, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On January 18, 2019 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- 625 ILCS 5/3-402.1 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 3-402.1
- 625 ILCS 5/20-101 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 20-101
- 625 ILCS 5/3-815.1 rep. -
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor