+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (65)
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(b) / Motion Referred to Rules Committee
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) June 30, 2016
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Executive Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 2
- Arrived in House
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 011-005-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Executive
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; J. Cullerton
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Verified
- Third Reading - Passed; 031-019-003
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 26, 2016
- Approved for Consideration Assignments
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As October 20, 2015
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Executive
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As August 19, 2015
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As July 1, 2015
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As June 30, 2015
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton
- Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2015
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 29, 2015
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 28, 2015
- Do Pass Executive; 017-000-000
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Ira I. Silverstein
- Assigned to Executive
- Waive Posting Notice
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 102-007-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 026-000-000
- Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-000-001
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Robyn Gabel
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 22, 2015
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Robyn Gabel
- House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 30, 2015
- Assigned to Executive Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
+ − Adopted Amendments (3)
Senate Amendment 002
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Chicago Teacher Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Requires the State to contribute to the Public School Teachers' Pension and Retirement Fund of Chicago $205,404,986 for fiscal year 2017. Provides that beginning in fiscal year 2018, the State shall contribute an amount equal to the employer normal cost for that fiscal year. Includes provisions for certifications and monthly payments by voucher. Amends the State Pension Funds Continuing Appropriation Act. Provides for a continuing appropriation to the Public School Teachers' Pension and Retirement Fund of Chicago, on a continuing monthly basis, of the amount, if any, by which the total available amount of all other State appropriations to that Retirement Fund for the payment of certain State contributions is less than the total amount of the vouchers for required State contributions lawfully submitted by the Fund for that month under applicable provisions of the Illinois Pension Code. Amends the School Code. Notwithstanding any other provision of law to the contrary, provides for supplemental general State aid to be provided in the form of an equity grant for the 2016-2017 school year through the 2018-2019 school year; specifies the grant amount calculation. Sets forth amounts and priorities for amounts appropriated under the State aid formula provisions for the 2016-2017 school year through the 2018-2019 school year. Provides that a separate tax shall be levied by the City of Chicago for the purpose of making an employer contribution to the Public School Teachers' Pension and Retirement Fund of Chicago. Requires the proceeds from this separate tax to be paid directly to that Retirement Fund. Amends the Chicago Teachers Article of the Illinois Pension Code to make conforming changes. Effective immediately.
House Amendment 001
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Boundary Changes Article of the School Code. Provides that in all proceedings under the Article to change by detachment, annexation, division, dissolution, or any combination of those methods the boundaries of any school district (other than the Chicago school district) located in an educational service region of 2,000,000 or more inhabitants in which the regional board of school trustees is abolished, a hearing panel of 3 members from the governing board of the affected educational service center (rather than the trustees of schools of the township in which that school district is located, as the successor to the former regional board of school trustees with respect to all territory located in that school township) shall have, exercise, and perform all powers, duties, and responsibilities required under the Article to be exercised and performed in those proceedings by a regional board of school trustees; makes related changes. Provides that the chief administrative officers of the educational service centers shall have, exercise, and perform all powers, duties, and responsibilities required under the Article that are otherwise assigned to regional superintendents of schools. Sets forth provisions concerning the hearing panel and the chief administrative officer.
+ − Statutes Amended (8)
- 105 ILCS 5/2-3.33 - from Ch. 122, par. 2-3.33
- 105 ILCS 5/2-3.33 -
- 105 ILCS 5/7-04 - from Ch. 122, par. 7-04
- 40 ILCS 5/17-127 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 17-127
- 40 ILCS 5/17-129 - from Ch. 108 1/2, par. 17-129
- 40 ILCS 15/1.1 -
- 105 ILCS 5/18-8.05 -
- 105 ILCS 5/34-53 - from Ch. 122, par. 34-53