+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (48)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0634
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date January 1, 2004
- Sent to the Governor
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules - Re-Refer Motion to Labor Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Jay C. Hoffman
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jay C. Hoffman
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends be Adopted Labor Committee; 012-000-000
- 3/5 Vote Required
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 080-030-000
- Passed Both Houses
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
- Arrived in House
- Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Ronen
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Adopted Labor & Commerce; 007-001-001
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Carol Ronen
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Carol Ronen
- Approved for Consideration Rules
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading November 19, 2003
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Rules
- Third Reading Deadline Extended - Rule 2-10, to December 31, 2003.
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 7, 2003
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 6, 2003
- Do Pass Executive; 007-004-000
- Assigned to Executive
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 9, 2003
- Arrive in Senate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 069-044-004
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate **
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 010-000-000
- Assigned to Executive Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Larry McKeon
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
+ − Adopted Amendment
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything. Creates the Illinois Unemployment Insurance Trust Fund Financing Act. Authorizes the Department of Employment Security to issue revenue bonds secured by fund building receipts collected under the Unemployment Insurance Act. The proceeds of the bonds shall be used to, among other things, fund a surplus in Illinois' account in the Unemployment Trust Fund of the United States Treasury. Amends the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois, the Illinois Income Tax Act, and the Unemployment Insurance Act. Makes various changes in relation to the Illinois Unemployment Insurance Trust Fund Financing Act and also in relation to the Employment Security Advisory Board and numerous fiscal matters and other matters. Contains provisions concerning severability and inseverability. Effective January 1, 2004.
+ − Statute Amended
- 820 ILCS 405/3200 - from Ch. 48, par. 310