+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (36)
On July 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
On May 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On May 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2016
On May 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), this amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments.
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Education
On May 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John M. Sullivan
On May 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John M. Sullivan
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John M. Sullivan
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
On May 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 27, 2016
On May 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Education
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Assignments
- First Reading
On April 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 21, 2015
- Arrive in Senate
On April 16, 2015 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
On April 15, 2015 in the House:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Scott Drury
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Civil Committee; 011-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Scott Drury
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
On April 7, 2015 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Scott Drury
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 30, 2015
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
+ − Adopted Amendments (4)
House Amendment 002
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the School Code to add provisions concerning student and educator data privacy. Amends the Illinois School Student Records Act to make changes concerning definitions. Sets forth provisions allowing disclosure of student records to researchers at an accredited post-secondary educational institution or an organization conducting research if specified requirements are met. Amends the Children's Privacy Protection and Parental Empowerment Act to change the definition of "child" to mean a person under the age of 18 (instead of 16).
+ − Statutes Amended (8)
- 105 ILCS 5/1A-2.1 - from Ch. 122, par. 1A-2.1
- 105 ILCS 5/1A-2.1 -
- 105 ILCS 5/22-80 new -
- 105 ILCS 5/22-81 new -
- 105 ILCS 10/2 - from Ch. 122, par. 50-2
- 105 ILCS 10/6 - from Ch. 122, par. 50-6
- 105 ILCS 10/9 - from Ch. 122, par. 50-9
- 325 ILCS 17/5 -
+ − Votes (3)
April 16, 2015: HB0810 - Third Reading - Thursday, April 16, 2015
April 15, 2015: HFA0002 - Judiciary - Civil - Apr 15, 2015
April 14, 2015: HB0810 - Executive - Apr 14, 2015
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor