+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On March 27, 2021 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Revenue & Finance Committee
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- To Property Tax Subcommittee
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
On February 10, 2021 in the House:
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
On February 9, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II