+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On January 13, 2021 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On June 23, 2020 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
On April 12, 2019 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 11, 2019 in the House:
- State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
On April 10, 2019 in the House:
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 1, 2019 in the House:
- State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
- Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 28, 2019 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Appropriations-Human Services Committee; 010-005-000
On January 29, 2019 in the House:
- Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
On January 9, 2019 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On November 30, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. Mary E. Flowers
+ − Statute Amended
- New Act -