+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (36)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 25, 2007 in the House:
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On May 18, 2007 in the House:
- Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 25, 2007
On May 10, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 18, 2007
On May 3, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 10, 2007
On April 27, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 3, 2007
On April 24, 2007 in the House:
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted by Voice Vote
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted by Voice Vote
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On April 18, 2007 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
On April 17, 2007 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. John A. Fritchey
On March 15, 2007 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 011-000-000
On March 7, 2007 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee
On March 5, 2007 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. John A. Fritchey
On February 27, 2007 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
On February 23, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On February 22, 2007 in the House:
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 011-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in State Government Administration Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by State Government Administration Committee
On January 31, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
On January 29, 2007 in the House:
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Elizabeth Coulson
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jack D. Franks
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Paul D. Froehlich
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Elizabeth Coulson
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jack D. Franks
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Jack D. Franks
- Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Paul D. Froehlich
On January 19, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On December 5, 2006 in the House:
- Prefiled with Clerk by Rep. John A. Fritchey
+ − Adopted Amendments (3)
House Committee Amendment No. 1
In the General Assembly Staff Assistants Act, changes the responsibility for posting witness slips from a staff person designated by the committee to the legislative committee clerk, as assigned. Removes the bill's July 1, 2007 effective date.
+ − Statutes Amended (14)
- 5 ILCS 430/5-47 new -
- 5 ILCS 430/50-5 -
- 15 ILCS 305/14 -
- 25 ILCS 160/3 new -
- 25 ILCS 170/2 - from Ch. 63, par. 172
- 25 ILCS 170/3 - from Ch. 63, par. 173
- 25 ILCS 170/3.1 -
- 25 ILCS 170/5 -
- 25 ILCS 170/6 - from Ch. 63, par. 176
- 25 ILCS 170/6.5 -
- 25 ILCS 170/7 - from Ch. 63, par. 177
- 25 ILCS 170/10 - from Ch. 63, par. 180
- 25 ILCS 170/11 - from Ch. 63, par. 181
- 25 ILCS 170/4 rep. -
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor