+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0449
- Effective Date August 14, 2009
- Governor Approved
- Sent to the Governor
- Passed Both Houses
- Third Reading - Passed; 045-013-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2009
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 12, 2009
- Do Pass Executive; 011-000-000
- Assigned to Executive
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Emil Jones, III
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 21, 2009
- Arrive in Senate
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 061-055-001
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Environment & Energy Committee; 013-002-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Environment & Energy Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Environment & Energy Committee
- Assigned to Environment & Energy Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert Rita
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Amends the Public Utilities Act. Provides that beginning in February 1999 and through January 2013 (rather than January 2009), each qualified solid waste energy facility that sells electricity to an electric utility at the purchase rate described in specified provisions shall file with the Department of Revenue on or before the 15th of each month a form, prescribed by the Department of Revenue, that states the number of kilowatt hours of electricity for which payment was received at that purchase rate from electric utilities in Illinois during the immediately preceding month. Provides that Beginning on July 1, 2006 through January 31, 2013 (rather than January 31, 2009), each month the State Treasurer shall certify the following to the State Comptroller specified information. Provides that the State Treasurer, without appropriation, must make distributions immediately after January 15, April 15, July 15, and October 15 of each year, up to maximum aggregate distributions of $500,000 for the distributions made in the 4 quarters beginning with the April distribution and ending with the January distribution, from the Municipal Economic Development Fund to each city, village, or incorporated town located within Cook county that has approved construction within its boundaries of an incinerator that will burn recovered wood processed for fuel to generate electricity and will commence operation after 2009 (rather than (1) uses or, on the effective date of Public Act 90-813, used municipal waste as its primary fuel to generate electricity; (2) was determined by the Illinois Commerce Commission to qualify as a qualified solid waste energy facility prior to the effective date of Public Act 89-448; and (3) commenced operation prior to January 1, 1998). Provides that the distributions may also be used for cleanup of open dumping from vacant properties and the removal of structures condemned by the city, village, or incorporated town. Effective immediately.