+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2008; Substantive House Bills Out of Committee
On May 11, 2007 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Rules
On May 1, 2007 in the Senate:
- Fiscal Note Filed as Engrossed, from the Illinois Department of Healthcare and Family Services.
On March 30, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Public Health
On March 13, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
On March 8, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
On March 2, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 1, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 008-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Human Services Committee
On February 15, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On February 7, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David R. Leitch
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Provides that the Department of Healthcare and Family Services shall reimburse advanced practice nurses for psychiatric services that they provide to recipients of medical assistance "pursuant to a collaborative agreement with a collaborating physician that authorizes the provision of psychiatric services" (instead of "as authorized by Illinois law").
+ − Statute Amended
+ − Vote
March 8, 2007: HB0775 - Third Reading - Thursday, March 08, 2007
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor