+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (61)
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-1086
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date February 15, 2005
- Sent to the Governor
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Arrived in House
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Susana Mendoza
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Susana Mendoza
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Susana Mendoza
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1,2
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 105-010-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 105-010-000
- Passed Both Houses
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules
- Approved for Consideration Rules
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading January 11, 2005
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Miguel del Valle
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Education
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Approved for Consideration Education; 007-004-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; del Valle
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
- Third Reading - Passed; 033-023-000
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Rules
- Third Reading Deadline Extended - Rule 2-10, extended to January 11, 2005.
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Adopted Education; 007-000-000
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; del Valle
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 13, 2004
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Education
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Miguel del Valle
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 12, 2004
- Approved for Consideration Rules
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Miguel del Valle
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Rules
- Third Reading Deadline Extended - Rule 2-10, to December 31, 2003.
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 7, 2003
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 6, 2003
- Do Pass Executive; 007-004-000
- Assigned to Executive
- Arrive in Senate
- Referred to Rules
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 9, 2003
- First Reading
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 069-044-004
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate **
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 010-000-000
- Assigned to Executive Committee
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Calvin L. Giles
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Amends the School Code to repeal provisions concerning the Capital Assistance Program, the Department of School District Organization, the Department of Urban Education, computer literacy grants, a review and study of the initial year of teaching, loans of mathematics and science equipment, the Center for Excellence in Teaching and pilot career compensation programs, a report of suggested changes in the suspension and revocation of teaching certificates, tutoring services, social group work demonstration projects, a junior high school courses report, a study on ways to improve teacher training, enrollment incentive programs, State Urban Education Partnership Grants, Federal Goals 2000 funds, the transfer of high school district territory, the repair of fences, minimal competency testing, a report of student statistics, continuation schools, State plans with respect to children with disabilities, a tax for health insurance, non-contract transportation, passenger seat backs on school buses, the Bridge Note Statute, and the School Building Commission. Amends the Capital Development Board Act, the Building Authority Act, and the School Code to make corresponding changes. Effective immediately.
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything after the enacting clause. Amends the School Code to repeal provisions concerning the Capital Assistance Program, the Department of School District Organization, the Department of Urban Education, computer literacy grants, a review and study of the initial year of teaching, loans of mathematics and science equipment, the Center for Excellence in Teaching and pilot career compensation programs, a report of suggested changes in the suspension and revocation of teaching certificates, tutoring services, social group work demonstration projects, a junior high school courses report, a study on ways to improve teacher training, enrollment incentive programs, State Urban Education Partnership Grants, Federal Goals 2000 funds, the transfer of high school district territory, the repair of fences, minimal competency testing, a report of student statistics, continuation schools, State plans with respect to children with disabilities, a tax for health insurance, non-contract transportation, passenger seat backs on school buses, the Bridge Note Statute, and the School Building Commission. Amends the Capital Development Board Act, the Building Authority Act, and the School Code to make corresponding changes. Effective immediately.