+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (60)
On July 21, 2004 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 93-0780
- Effective Date January 1, 2005
- Governor Approved
On June 25, 2004 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 27, 2004 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 064-049-002
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 064-049-002
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends be Adopted Executive Committee; 008-001-000
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends be Adopted Executive Committee; 009-000-000
On May 26, 2004 in the House:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Executive Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Executive Committee
On May 24, 2004 in the House:
- Sponsor Removed Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Daniel J. Burke
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Daniel J. Burke
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
On May 18, 2004 in the House:
- Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Daniel J. Burke
On May 13, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2
- Arrived in House
On May 13, 2004 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 040-013-001
On May 12, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 13, 2004
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; DeLeo
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Be Adopted Executive; 010-000-000
On May 11, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Executive
On May 5, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 6, 2004
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; DeLeo
- Recalled to Second Reading
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Be Adopted Executive; 011-000-000
On April 22, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James A. DeLeo
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules
On March 31, 2004 in the Senate:
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. James A. DeLeo
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. James A. DeLeo
On March 30, 2004 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 31, 2004
- Approved for Consideration Rules
On July 1, 2003 in the Senate:
- Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Rules
On May 16, 2003 in the Senate:
- Third Reading Deadline Extended - Rule 2-10, to December 31, 2003.
On May 6, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 7, 2003
- Second Reading
On May 1, 2003 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 6, 2003
- Do Pass Executive; 007-004-000
On April 16, 2003 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On April 8, 2003 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 9, 2003
- Referred to Rules
On April 3, 2003 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 069-044-004
On April 2, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate **
On March 31, 2003 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 12, 2003 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 010-000-000
On February 4, 2003 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On January 31, 2003 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything. Amends the Liquor Control Act of 1934. In the provisions prohibiting the sale of alcoholic liquor within 100 feet of a school, creates an exception for a grocery store that meets certain conditions.
Senate Floor Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything. Amends the Liquor Control Act of 1934. In the provisions prohibiting the sale of alcoholic liquor within 100 feet of a school, creates an exception for a grocery store that meets certain conditions.
+ − Statute Amended
- 235 ILCS 5/6-14 - from Ch. 43, par. 129