+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (37)
On July 30, 2021 in the House:
- Governor Approved
- Effective Date January 1, 2022
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0184
On June 23, 2021 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 27, 2021 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 25, 2021
On May 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 10, 2021
On May 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Do Pass Criminal Law; 009-000-000
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 6, 2021
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Criminal Law
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
On April 16, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000
On April 15, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading - Consent Calendar
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar
- Removed from Consent Calendar Status Rep. Dave Vella
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
On April 8, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar
On March 23, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Judiciary - Criminal Committee; by Voice Vote
- Do Pass as Amended / Consent Calendar Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 019-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dave Vella
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
On March 19, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Dave Vella
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Dave Vella
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Amendment 002
Replaces everything after the enacting clause. Reinserts the provisions of the bill as introduced, with the following changes: Provides that certain orders may be permanent at the victim's request. If a civil no contact order entered under a specified section of the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963 conflicts with an order issued pursuant to the Juvenile Court Act of 1987 or the Illinois Marriage and Dissolution of Marriage Act, the conflicting order issued under the Code of Criminal Procedure of 1963 shall be void.
+ − Proposed Amendments (2)
+ − Statutes Amended (2)
- 725 ILCS 5/112A-20 - from Ch. 38, par. 112A-20
- 725 ILCS 5/112A-23 - from Ch. 38, par. 112A-23
+ − Votes (4)
May 27, 2021: HB0734
May 4, 2021: HB0734 - Criminal Law
April 16, 2021: HB0734 - Third Reading
March 23, 2021: HB0734 - Judiciary - Criminal
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor