+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On April 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
On May 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
On May 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Criminal Law
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Cristina H. Pacione-Zayas
- First Reading
- Referred to Assignments
- Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John Connor
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 22, 2021
On April 21, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 117-000-000
On April 16, 2021 in the House:
- Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day
On April 14, 2021 in the House:
- Second Reading - Consent Calendar
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar
On March 18, 2021 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; by Voice Vote
- Do Pass as Amended / Consent Calendar Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 010-000-000
On March 11, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
On March 9, 2021 in the House:
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
- First Reading
- Referred to Rules Committee
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Amendment 001
Allows employees of facilities subject to the Automotive Repair Act and Automotive Collision Repair Act (instead of mechanics) to possess a vehicle security circumvention device.
+ − Proposed Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- 625 ILCS 5/12-614 new