+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On April 24, 2015 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
- Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On April 22, 2015 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 To Sentencing, Penalties, and Criminal Procedure Subcommittee
On April 20, 2015 in the House:
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
On April 14, 2015 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
On March 27, 2015 in the House:
- Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) April 30, 2015
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
On February 17, 2015 in the House:
- Assigned to Executive Committee
On February 3, 2015 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 2, 2015 in the House:
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
+ − Adopted Amendments (3)
+ − Statute Amended
- 50 ILCS 330/4 - from Ch. 85, par. 804
+ − Vote
April 14, 2015: HB0733 - Executive - Apr 14, 2015
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor