+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (39)
On October 17, 2007 in the House:
- Public Act . . . . . . . . . 95-0645
- Effective Date October 11, 2007
On October 11, 2007 in the House:
- Amendatory Veto Overridden Both Houses
On October 11, 2007 in the Senate:
- Override Amendatory Veto - Senate Passed 045-012-000
- 3/5 Vote Required
On October 10, 2007 in the Senate:
- Motion Filed Override Amendatory Veto Sen. Linda Holmes
- Placed on Calendar Amendatory Veto October 11, 2007
On October 2, 2007 in the House:
- Override Amendatory Veto - House Passed 113-000-000
- 3/5 Vote Required
On September 21, 2007 in the House:
- Motion Filed Override Amendatory Veto Rep. Ruth Munson
On September 19, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Amendatory Veto October 2, 2007
On August 13, 2007 in the House:
- Governor Amendatory Veto
On June 14, 2007 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 16, 2007 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 16, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
- Third Reading - Passed; 039-015-001
On May 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 16, 2007
- Second Reading
On May 11, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Rules
On April 25, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Held in Public Health
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 26, 2007
- Do Pass Public Health; 006-004-000
On April 24, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Public Health
On April 23, 2007 in the Senate:
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules
- Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Linda Holmes
On March 30, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Public Health
On March 6, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Arrive in Senate
On March 2, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 110-000-000
On February 23, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 22, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 009-000-000
On February 15, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Human Services Committee
On February 7, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ruth Munson
+ − Adopted Amendment
+ − Statute Amended
- New Act -
+ − Votes (4)
October 11, 2007: HB0732 - Motion - Thursday, October 11, 2007
October 2, 2007: HB0732 - Motion - Tuesday, October 02, 2007
May 16, 2007: HB0732 - Third Reading - Wednesday, May 16, 2007
March 2, 2007: HB0732 - Third Reading - Friday, March 02, 2007
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor