+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On January 13, 2009 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 22, 2008; Substantive House Bills Out of Committee
On May 15, 2007 in the Senate:
- Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Rules
- To Subcommittee
On May 3, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Transportation
On April 20, 2007 in the Senate:
- Referred to Rules
- First Reading
On March 22, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading March 27, 2007
- Arrive in Senate
On March 21, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
On March 13, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 2, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On March 1, 2007 in the House:
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 010-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in State Government Administration Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by State Government Administration Committee
On February 15, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
On February 7, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Harry R. Ramey, Jr.
+ − Adopted Amendment
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Amends the Cycle Rider Safety Training Act. Provides for certain disbursements from the Cycle Rider Safety Training Fund notwithstanding any other provision of law to the contrary adopted after the effective date of the Act. Effective immediately.
+ − Statutes Amended (3)
- 625 ILCS 35/4 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 804
- 625 ILCS 35/6 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 806
- 625 ILCS 35/7 - from Ch. 95 1/2, par. 807
+ − Vote
March 21, 2007: HB0729 - Third Reading - Wednesday, March 21, 2007
+ − Sponsors (30)
Type:
Primary Sponsor