+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 26, 2004 in the House:
- Re-committed to Rules Committee
On May 13, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass / Short Debate Appropriations-Human Services Committee; 012-000-000
On May 5, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
On February 20, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 19, 2004 in the House:
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Gary Hannig
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan