+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 26, 2004 in the House:
- Re-committed to Rules Committee
On May 13, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
- Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Appropriations-Human Services Committee; 012-000-000
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Appropriations-Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Appropriations-Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote
- House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Appropriations-Human Services Committee
- House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Appropriations-Human Services Committee
On May 5, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
On February 20, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 19, 2004 in the House:
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Gary Hannig
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan
+ − Adopted Amendments (2)
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything and re-inserts the same line items, but makes certain appropriations to the Department of Human Rights and other appropriations to the Human Rights Commission (rather than making all appropriations to both the Department of Human Rights and the Human Rights Commission).
House Committee Amendment No. 1
Deletes everything and re-inserts the same line items, but makes certain appropriations to the Department of Human Rights and other appropriations to the Human Rights Commission (rather than making all appropriations to both the Department of Human Rights and the Human Rights Commission).