+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On October 5, 2007 in the House:
- Total Veto Stands - No Positive Action Taken
On September 19, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Total Veto October 2, 2007
On August 13, 2007 in the House:
- Governor Vetoed
On June 14, 2007 in the House:
- Sent to the Governor
On May 16, 2007 in the House:
- Passed Both Houses
On May 16, 2007 in the Senate:
- Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
On May 3, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 8, 2007
- Second Reading
On May 2, 2007 in the Senate:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 3, 2007
- Do Pass Executive; 009-000-000
On March 30, 2007 in the Senate:
- Assigned to Executive
On March 13, 2007 in the Senate:
- Arrive in Senate
- First Reading
- Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading
- Referred to Rules
On March 8, 2007 in the House:
- Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000
On March 2, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On February 23, 2007 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
On February 22, 2007 in the House:
- Do Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 013-000-000
On February 8, 2007 in the House:
- Assigned to Higher Education Committee
On February 6, 2007 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William B. Black
+ − Statute Amended
- 110 ILCS 805/3-9 - from Ch. 122, par. 103-9