+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On January 10, 2023 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On July 18, 2021 in the House:
- Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
On March 19, 2021 in the House:
- To Special Issues (AP) Subcommittee
On March 2, 2021 in the House:
- Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee
On February 8, 2021 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sonya M. Harper
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor