+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On January 11, 2005 in the House:
- Session Sine Die
On May 26, 2004 in the House:
- Re-committed to Rules Committee
On March 31, 2004 in the House:
- Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
- Second Reading - Short Debate
On March 24, 2004 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
- Do Pass / Short Debate Approp-Elementary and Secondary Education Committee; 018-002-000
On February 26, 2004 in the House:
- Assigned to Approp-Elementary and Secondary Education Committee
On February 17, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Rules Committee
- First Reading
On February 13, 2004 in the House:
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael K. Smith
- Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Gary Hannig
- Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan